CUMBRIA- RUNGWE COMMUNITY LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In West Cumbria, operates a Link between the communities of West Cumbria (UK) and Rungwe (Tanzania), through exchange visits, education and awareness events, and supporting educational and community projects in Rungwe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
- Tanzania
Governance
- 29 September 1992: Standard registration
- WEST CUMBRIA-TANZANIA LINK (Working name)
- COPELAND RUNGWE COMMUNITY LINK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashleigh Jordan Hannah Huddart | Chair | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amy Fletcher | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Martin Patterson | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Coan | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Fowler | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Geen | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stephen Lewthwaite | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Julia Flynn | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ellen Crowther | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Ellen Talbot Rogers | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Fisher | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christian White | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Mary Lee | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amy Marie Ireland | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.11k | £22.79k | £10.96k | £19.81k | £33.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.66k | £13.01k | £44.53k | £15.72k | £19.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JULY 1992 AS AMENDED 26 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2016 as amended on 03 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS, PRIMARILY IN WEST CUMBRIA, BY;- (A) ASSISTING TRAVEL TO TANZANIA TO PARTICIPATE IN AID AND DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS AND TO LEARN ABOUT THE COUNTRY (B) ENABLING THOSE WHO HAVE TAKEN PART IN SUCH VISITS TO GIVE TALKS AND PRESENTATIONS FOR THE EDUCATION OF OTHERS ON THEIR RETURN (C) ASSISTING YOUNG TANZANIANS TO COME TO WEST CUMBRIA TO LEARN ABOUT THE AREA AND TEACH OTHERS ABOUT THEIR OWN COUNTRY (D) PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND MATERIALS TOWARDS THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CURRICULUM IN LOCAL SCHOOLS AND IN ADULT EDUCATION IN WEST CUMBRIA (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH AID AND DEVELOPMENT, PARTICULARLY IN RUNGWE DISTRICT, TANZANIA
Area of benefit
WEST CUMBRIA AND RUNGWE DISTRICT, TANZANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Jericho Road
WHITEHAVEN
Cumbria
CA28 6UB
- Phone:
- 01946822580
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window