SCHOENSTATT MOVEMENT IN ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to: Advance the Christian religion and religious education. Advance the education of young people by providing facilities for their recreation and leisure time, so that they may grow to maturity as responsible members of society. Promote the preservation of family life by providing education for the general public in accordance with the principles of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 October 1992: Standard registration
- SCHOENSTATT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAMIAN JOSEPH GANLEY | Chair | 29 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
KONRAD WILHELM ANTONIUS OSTMEIER | Trustee | 29 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN MADDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.35k | £16.07k | £16.52k | £14.22k | £23.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.51k | £15.67k | £22.48k | £14.89k | £27.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 AUGUST 1992
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION.2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR BOT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION,SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.3.TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF FAMILY LIFE BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON ISSUES AFFECTING FAMILY LIFE,IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 HILL LANE
BLACKLEY
MANCHESTER
M9 6PF
- Phone:
- 447702832808
- Email:
- pattyganley@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window