THE FRIENDS OF ELMBRIDGE INFANTS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1014563
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising funds for Elmbridge Infant School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £32

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 1992: Standard registration
  • 14 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £3.19k £1.08k £0 £791 £0
Total expenditure £3.09k £1.53k £376 £1.57k £32
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 18 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 09 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required