SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS COMMUNITY CHURCH
Charity number: 1014566
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £150
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
- Essex
Governance
Registration history:
- 08 October 1992: Standard registration
- 14 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.02k | £861 | £422 | £1.35k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £0 | £2.17k | £17.62k | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 08 November 2012 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 31 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 29 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS, ESSEX
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window