ST LUKE'S PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1014568
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for school equipment eg playground equipment. Done through fairs, quiz evening, cake sales and other small events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2011
Total income: £7,834
Total expenditure: £11,083
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
Registration history:
- 05 October 1992: Standard registration
- 08 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- ST LUKES P T A (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.77k | £16.93k | £8.91k | £9.03k | £7.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.39k | £9.08k | £13.79k | £5.70k | £11.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6/4/92
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE MAIDENHEAD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window