BRITISH REFUGEE COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Refugee Council is one of the leading charities in the UK working directly with refugees, and supporting them to rebuild their lives. We also speak up for refugees using our direct work as an evidence base, ensuring refugees have a stronger and more influential voice in decisions that will affect them. We work with a range of partners and in collaboration to ensure we best support our clients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£20,697,000
Donations and legacies | £9.13m | |
Charitable activities | £11.40m | |
Other trading activities | £24.00k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £145.00k |
Total expenditure:
£19,364,000
Raising funds | £2.69m | |
Charitable activities | £16.67m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,131,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £8,457,000 from 27 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.69m | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.67m | |
Retained for future use | £1.33m |
People

339 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
423 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 October 1992: Standard registration
- REFUGEE COUNCIL (Working name)
- THE REFUGEE COUNCIL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Marion Orr | Chair | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sayyeda Salam | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Diana Fawcett | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Hanham | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Ruth Oppenheimer | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ghino Parker | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLARE EMILY PATERSON | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Power | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth McLoughlin | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lyndall Norma Stein | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.24m | £12.60m | £15.79m | £19.07m | £20.70m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.84m | £11.55m | £12.92m | £17.11m | £19.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.85m | £3.87m | £383.00k | £45.00k | £2.13m | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50m | £3.09m | £7.15m | £8.40m | £8.46m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.87m | £4.49m | £6.10m | £6.24m | £9.13m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £258.00k | £6.00k | £8.93k | £9.00k | £24.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.11m | £8.11m | £9.68m | £12.80m | £11.40m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.00k | £2.00k | £0 | £29.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £145.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £401.00k | £551.00k | £389.00k | £2.50m | £3.95m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.58m | £10.31m | £11.22m | £15.90m | £16.67m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.26m | £1.24m | £1.70m | £1.21m | £2.69m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £107.00k | £129.00k | £61.18k | £171.00k | £289.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £583.00k | £974.00k | £1.16m | £1.44m | £997.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £704.00k | £634.00k | £539.07k | £685.00k | £602.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Other assets | £5.73m | £7.30m | £10.57m | £13.16m | £14.31m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.52m | £1.96m | £2.26m | £3.04m | £2.77m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/06/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAR 2016 as amended on 28 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
A)TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) PROTECTING THE RIGHTS OF THOSE INDIVIDUALS C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST IN THEIR REHABILITATION WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY D) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF REFUGEES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND WAYS OF PROVIDING CHARITABLE RELIEF FOR THEM AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH E) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE POSITION OF REFUGEES AND THE SITUATIONS WHICH GIVE RISE TO REFUGEE MOVEMENTS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITISH REFUGEE COUNCIL
134 - 138 The Grove
LONDON
E15 1NS
- Phone:
- 02073466700
- Email:
- info@refugeecouncil.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window