THE CORNWALL COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Umbrella body Education/training Arts/culture Sport/recreation Environment/conservation/heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 October 1992: Standard registration
- C F W I (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Avril Gillian Pile | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Anne Camps | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Edgcumbe | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Laura Andrews | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jane Fiander | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Baker | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Mary Thompson | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pam Selley | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Johnson | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS GRACE BRADFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.26k | £48.70k | £62.92k | £101.12k | £136.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.95k | £71.72k | £80.01k | £120.80k | £152.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/06/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE MOVEMENT IN CORNWALL, THE ISLES OF SCILLY AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
CORNWALL, ISLES OF SCILLY AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chy Noweth and Conteth
Truro Business Park
Threemilestone
Truro
Cornwall
TR4 9NH
- Phone:
- 01872272843
- Email:
- secretary@cornwallwi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window