UNIVERSAL SPIRITUALIST ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AUHS offer courses and insurance for Minister?s, Healers and Mediums; together with Affiliation for Spiritualist Churches/Groups in the UK only with individual individual memberships. Very low Fees cover running costs only as we are none profit making and all Trustees are unpaid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 October 1992: Standard registration
- ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSAL HEALERS AND SPIRITUALISTS (Working name)
- AUHS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PHILIP GREENUP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Catherine Greenup | Trustee | 04 September 2005 |
|
|
||||
REV STEWART ROBERTSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.21k | £1.62k | £1.48k | £965 | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £1.85k | £1.58k | £1.52k | £1.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 2ND JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED 3RD JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SPIRITUALIST RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR THE UNIVERSAL SPIRITUALIST CHURCH THROUGHOUT THE OFFICES OF THE ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Stoney Lane
Springwell Village
Gateshead
NE9 7SJ
- Phone:
- 01914163689
- Email:
- p123greenup@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window