Accounts and annual returns HOGSTHORPE MEMORIAL RECREATION AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 1014611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 April 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 February 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required