Financial history HOGSTHORPE MEMORIAL RECREATION AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 1014611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.30k £1.56k £5.63k £3.51k £4.40k
Total expenditure £8.47k £622 £1.76k £1.73k £102
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A