Accounts and annual returns GATEWAY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1014613
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 07 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 18 April 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2016 19 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 31 March 2017 On Time