Financial history GATEWAY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1014613
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £32.10k £38.50k £44.44k £42.70k £8.88k
Total expenditure £33.34k £37.32k £46.37k £40.78k £20.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £43.61k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.46k £24.75k £0 N/A N/A