GATEWAY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of nursery education at Dale Abbey & Stanton by Dale operated in accordance with Christian principles for the education of children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 06 October 1992: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.10k | £38.50k | £44.44k | £42.70k | £8.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.34k | £37.32k | £46.37k | £40.78k | £20.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £43.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.46k | £24.75k | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 11 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 07 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 23 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 18 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 19 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 31 March 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS AT DALE ABBEY AND STANTON BY DALE IN THE COUNTY OF DERBY OPERATED IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN
Area of benefit
DALE ABBEY AND STANTON BY DALE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window