ORPHAN AID ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve children in need particularly those living on the streets and in sewers, also orphanages/hospitals in Romania by providing them with aid that is not available in their own country. Including example in date food, childrens and adults clothing, toys, educational items (writing books/pens etc), basic medical supplies (plasters etc), toiletries and of course money when available
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
- Romania
Governance
- 07 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER HADDLESEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Hoyle | Trustee | 03 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN HADDLESEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.18k | £15.07k | £17.24k | £15.77k | £18.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.44k | £9.19k | £12.31k | £8.37k | £11.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED 20 JULY 1992.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN IN NEED PARTICULARLY THOSE IN ORPHANAGES AND HOSPITALS IN ROMANIA AND ALBANIA BY PROVIDING SUITABLE AID AND ASSISTANCE WHICH IS NOT NORMALLY AVAILABLE IN THEIR OWN COUNTRY.
Area of benefit
ROMANIA AND ALBANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 SOUTHCROFT AVENUE
BIRKENSHAW
BRADFORD
BD11 2DD
- Phone:
- 01274689353
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window