Financial history MALUJU - SOUTH AFRICAN ARTISTS FOR PEACE

Charity Number: 1014647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.00k £500 £89 £78 £30
Total expenditure £950 £500 £89 £78 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A