MOIRA REPLAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has continued to provide a wide range of support services to the local community. Meeting rooms for a number of local groups are much appreciated by organisations on low incomes. The partnership with Leicestershire County Council Community Services and Adult Learning Services has enabled local people to access learning facilities that would not normally be available to them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 October 1992: Standard registration
- Replan Community Hub (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
USHA ROGERS | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT DUDLEY JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
JOHN VICKERS | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Sidney Knight Mr | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Parker | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA THOMAS | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|||||
CATHERINE BALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.89k | £14.91k | £15.92k | £40.54k | £38.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.10k | £13.08k | £12.45k | £35.72k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £3.00k | £4.00k | £8.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF MOIRA AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Area of benefit
AREA OF MOIRA AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Woodville Road
Overseal
SWADLINCOTE
Derbyshire
DE12 6LU
- Phone:
- 01283760624
- Email:
- info@moirareplan.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window