SILVERDALE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides Open Space and an Institute users building for various activity groups within the village and from local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 09 October 1992: Standard registration
- THE SILVERDALE INSTITUTE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY BOND | Chair | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN BEGGS | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Neil Philip Bradburn | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Patching | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gail Armstrong | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Birch | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Clay | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Fletcher | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phil Craxford | Trustee | 17 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander John Finch | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.14k | £23.88k | £31.08k | £8.19k | £12.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.18k | £18.52k | £34.80k | £6.81k | £10.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £11.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE VILLAGE HALL,FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SILVERDALE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SILVERDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 EMESGATE LANE
SILVERDALE
CARNFORTH
LA5 0RF
- Phone:
- 01524702617
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window