ETHNIC AND ALL PEOPLES DISABLED GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 12 October 1992: Standard registration
- EAAPDG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FITZROY BECKFORD FRSA | Trustee |
|
||||||
LINA GUDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATSY ROBERTSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS IN PARTICULAR SUCH PERSONS FROM THE ETHNIC COMMUNITIES B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR DISABLED PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
233 CAREY GARDENS
LONDON
SW8 4HH
- Phone:
- 02077209979
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window