Financial history THE MUSIC HALL GUILD OF GREAT BRITAIN AND AMERICA & THE THEATRE AND FILM GUILD AND THE LITERARY GUILD

Charity number: 1014674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.56k £4.32k £2.68k £5.88k £1.29k
Total expenditure £17.41k £3.65k £3.32k £4.93k £815
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A