THE MUSIC HALL GUILD OF GREAT BRITAIN AND AMERICA & THE THEATRE AND FILM GUILD AND THE LITERARY GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To advance education in the history of music hall and theatre performers by undertaking research and identifying, restoring, erecting and beautifying memorials which are of educational interest. 2) The promotion, maintenance, improvement and advancement of education through the presentation of Music Hall and Theatre productions and encouragement of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- United States
Governance
- 09 October 1992: Standard registration
- OPEN ARTS AND DUBARRY'S MUSIC HALL (Previous name)
- THE MUSIC HALL GUILD OF GREAT BRITAIN & AMERICA AND THE THEATRE MEMORIAL GUILD (Previous name)
- THE MUSIC HALL GUILD OF GREAT BRITAIN AND AMERICA (Previous name)
- THE MUSIC HALL GUILD OF GREAT BRITAIN AND AMERICA (Previous name)
- THE MUSIC HALL GUILD OF GREAT BRITAIN AND AMERICA & THE THEATRE AND FILM GUILD OF GREAT BRITAIN AND AMERICA (Previous name)
- THE NEW MOON CHILDREN'S THEATRE WORKSHOP (IVY DAVIS PRODUCTIONS) (Previous name)
- THE STAGE DOOR CHILDRENS THEATRE WORKSHOP (THE YOUNG COMPANIONS) (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Daley | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine O'Connor | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Morkunas | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.56k | £4.32k | £2.68k | £5.88k | £1.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.41k | £3.65k | £3.32k | £4.93k | £815 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/09/1992 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 20/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 11/01/2013 as amended on 18 May 2018
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF MUSIC HALL AND THEATRE PRODUCTIONS AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF MUSIC HALL AND THEATRE PERFORMERS BY UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND IDENTIFYING, RESTORING, ERECTING AND BEAUTIFYING MEMORIALS WHICH ARE OF EDUCATIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH AND BEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Charity Administrator
c/o 113 Strongbow Crescent
Eltham
London
SE9 1DW
- Phone:
- 020 8859 3822
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window