HASTINGS BADGER PROTECTION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises surveillance work to protect wildlife from illegal persecution. Undertake surveys to safeguard Badgers from coming to harm, prior to and after any development work. All setts and other wildlife across Hastings and Rother monitored on a regular basis. Advise property owners on wildlife issues (protected species). Maintain and enhance our three main pieces of land.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 09 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Newbold | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DONALD SIDNEY WISE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA GOLFIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201 | £170 | £155 | £2.69k | £83 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.58k | £6.25k | £7.24k | £6.22k | £10.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/09/1992 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF THE BADGER AND ALL PROTECTED SPECIES OF WILDLIFE. TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES THAT HELP ADVANCE THE PUBLIC'S AWARENESS BY EDUCATION AND EXAMPLE CONCERNING WILDLIFE. AS INCIDENTAL TO FURTHER THE ABOVE DECLARED OBJECTS, TO ENCOURAGE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN TOLERANCE APPRECIATION AND HUMANE CONSIDERATION FOR ALL SPECIES OF WILDLIFE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE ENVIRONS OF HASTINGS AND ROTHER
Contact information
- Address:
-
304 BEXHILL ROAD
ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA
TN38 8AL
- Phone:
- 01424439168
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window