THE DIAGEO FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide funding to support community projects in developing markets within the Foundation's four focus areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Ecuador
- Ghana
- Haiti
- India
- Nepal
- Philippines
- Sierra Leone
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 09 October 1992: Standard registration
- 22 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- GRAND METROPOLITAN CHARITABLE TRUST (INTERNATIONAL) (Previous name)
- GRANDMET INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE GRANDMET FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49m | £1.08m | £803.92k | £676.62k | £115.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £876.19k | £1.31m | £1.45m | £866.88k | £273.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.49m | £1.07m | £802.20k | £676.62k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.55k | £2.37k | £1.72k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £867.07k | £1.30m | £1.44m | £837.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.79k | £7.98k | £9.46k | £26.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £846.21k | £1.27m | £1.42m | £817.29k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 26 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2016
(These accounts |
26 April 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 25 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | 26 April 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 23 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 23 April 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 26 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 31 March 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JULY 1992 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 19 JULY 1994 AND 3 JUNE 1996 AND 19 DECEMBER 1996 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 9 APRIL 1998 AND 11 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IN ANY COUNTRY OR COUNTRIES IN THE WORLD ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window