CHURCHILL OLD CHURCH PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing historical information & records on the local villages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 12 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Hobart | Chair | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Andrew Lillywhite Mr | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
David Price Mr | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Anita Hasler | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gwilym Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JANIE HEXTALL | Trustee | 13 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
David Hugh CHAMBERS | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Christine Mary Gowing | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Amanda Ponsonby | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
Carol Marie Chambers Mrs | Trustee | 06 April 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £11.52k | £2.93k | £2.91k | £2.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.34k | £939 | £2.70k | £1.33k | £5.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH SEPTEMBER 1992, AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 1996. AS AMENDED ON 30/08/2012 as amended on 14 Nov 2022 as amended on 18 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
For the public benefit, maintaining and preserving the old church of Churchill and Sarsden parish in the county of Oxfordshire (‘the old church’) as a heritage asset. Regularly opening the old church to the general public, visitors to the area and residents of West Oxfordshire and the Cotswolds, and interpreting for the public benefit its place in the history of the community. Developing and holding exhibitions and meetings based on the old church to promote the understanding of local history in the community.
Area of benefit
CHURCHILL, OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRCHWOOD
SIDINGS ROAD
CHURCHILL
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 6ND
- Phone:
- 01608658603
- Email:
- dhcbirchwood@outlook.com
- Website:
-
churchillheritage.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window