Accounts and annual returns THE HUNG CHENG AND BARONESS OLGA KNOOP TRUST FOR OPHTHALMIC RESEARCH

Charity number: 1014695
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 April 2025 448 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 28 April 2025 448 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 August 2024 556 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 14 August 2024 556 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required