Financial history THE HUNG CHENG AND BARONESS OLGA KNOOP TRUST FOR OPHTHALMIC RESEARCH

Charity number: 1014695
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £24.80k £22.41k £16.61k £25.54k £34.32k
Total expenditure £24.59k £14.77k £39.08k £32.94k £34.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A