THE HUNG CHENG AND BARONESS OLGA KNOOP TRUST FOR OPHTHALMIC RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Knoop Trust currently helps to fund ophthalmic research in Oxford. A post jointly held in St Cross College and the University Department of Ophthalmology is awarded from time to time to suitable applicants. The aim is to make the award annually when conditions permit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 12 October 1992: Standard registration
- KNOOP TRUST (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Mavor CBE | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Andrew John Pollard | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PEGGY FRITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.80k | £22.41k | £16.61k | £25.54k | £34.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.59k | £14.77k | £39.08k | £32.94k | £34.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 April 2025 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 April 2025 | 448 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 August 2024 | 556 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 August 2024 | 556 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JAN 1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF STUDENTS IN MEDICINE AND RELATED ARTS AND SCIENCES AND FOR THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Cross College
61
St Giles
Oxford
- Phone:
- 01865278492
- Email:
- master@stx.ox.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window