WOLSTANTON HIGH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE FUNDS WHICH ENABLES THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL EXTRA CURRICULIUM ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 12 October 1992: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.58k | £13.18k | £14.03k | £1.37k | £2.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | £3.70k | £16.22k | £2.72k | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 29 July 2009 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 11 July 2008 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 25 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 25 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME & DISTRICTS)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window