Financial history OVER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1014710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.14k £33.32k £60.59k £100.44k £53.53k
Total expenditure £45.44k £35.25k £49.77k £34.03k £31.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.13k £33.28k £6.00k £45.00k £9.97k