Trustees THE INSTITUTE OF TRAFFIC ACCIDENT INVESTIGATORS
Charity number: 1014784

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Davies | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Weaver | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gregg Nicholas Beatson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Moorcroft | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Andrews | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Iwan Parry | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Webb | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Claire Miller | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cash | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Crouch | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GEORGE WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN PAUL DUNK WHITE | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN SESTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.