Financial history THE FRIENDS OF WEST RISE JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1014785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £3.34k £3.34k £1.06k £2.45k £3.84k
Total expenditure £3.27k £3.27k £5.70k £4.00k £1.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A