THE FRIENDS OF WEST RISE JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We engage in fundraising activities and events at the school to raise funds for items such as improving play facilities in playground, new stage and costumes for drama,improving the school environment etc. We usually raise funds through discos, Christmas Fair, Easter Egg raffle etc. Parents and families are encouraged to particpate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- East Sussex
Governance
- 16 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriet Somerville | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN POORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34k | £1.06k | £2.45k | £3.84k | £7.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.27k | £5.70k | £4.00k | £1.43k | £1.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 February 2022 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/4/91
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE PUPILS ATTENDING WEST RISE JUNIOR SCHOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST RISE JUNIOR SCHOOL
CHAFFINCH ROAD
EASTBOURNE
BN23 7SL
- Phone:
- 01323764037
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window