NORDELPH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supply Village hall Facilities. Hall Hire for various functions (Parties, Wedding Receptions etc.) Bingo, Arts & Craft Club, Children's Drama Club, Social Events etc. Church Services, Polling station.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £4,722 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Scott | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Pinard | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Porter | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lyus | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John George Thomas Lyus | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mackie | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Mary Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Heywood | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.86k | £10.18k | £9.15k | £43.20k | £11.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.35k | £648 | £16.13k | £42.90k | £11.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £20.78k | £4.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT AND TRUST DEED DATED 28TH. AUGUST 1992
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORDELPH IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NORDELPH, NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nordelph Village Hall
High Street
Nordelph
DOWNHAM MARKET
Norfolk
PE38 0BL
- Phone:
- 07584946746
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window