4TH MORETON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCOUTING ACTIVITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH POLICY ORGANISATION AND RULES OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 19 October 1992: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 February 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Scott | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Scott | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Goaten | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Phillips | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Humphreys | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bella Hornby | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Hamblett | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Moore | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey McClure | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Wilson | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR DENNIS PEACOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP MCCLURE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.87k | £14.46k | £11.82k | £18.48k | £19.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.82k | £4.21k | £12.38k | £15.38k | £17.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Association
1a Paulsfield Drive
WIRRAL
CH46 0UA
- Phone:
- 07806585630
- Email:
- Akela_4th@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window