DANCE ADVANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise events which encourage young people to participate in and appreciate the arts, chiefly dance. We introduce children to culture and art forms, (chiefly dance), who would not otherwise have the opportunity. This can involve activities such as workshops, trips to theatrical performances etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 21 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Johnston William Gibbs-Murray | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Chandler | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOAN ELIZABETH GIBBS | Trustee | 22 October 1992 |
|
|
||||
SELENA JANE STEELE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/10/2019 | 08/10/2020 | 08/10/2021 | 08/10/2022 | 08/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £537 | £2 | £2 | £0 | £738 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £450 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 October 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 October 2019 | 26 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND RECREATION, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN AS MAY HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AND/OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, AND WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF BALLET, DANCE AND OTHER RELATED ARTS, EITHER BY TUITION OR ASSISTING CHILDREN TO ATTEND PROFESSIONAL PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, INNER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
100A MALLINSON ROAD
LONDON
SW11 1BN
- Phone:
- 02073502928
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window