FRANK COHEN SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of support and information for people with alcohol problems
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £14,006 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 20 October 1992: Standard registration
- FRANK COHEN CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERALD BRIAN LECKEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN LECKEY | Trustee | 01 February 1998 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM DOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD HALLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEFFREY HITCHEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.14k | £17.40k | £16.86k | £16.16k | £16.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.72k | £17.46k | £17.57k | £17.54k | £15.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00k | £14.01k | £14.01k | N/A | £14.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED 9 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND REHABILITATE PERSONS WHO LIVE OR WORK IN NORTH MANCHESTER SUFFERING FROM ALCOHOL DEPENDENCE PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING.
Area of benefit
NORTH MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRANK COHEN CENTRE
223 MOSTON LANE
MANCHESTER
M9 4HE
- Phone:
- 07963806951
- Email:
- frank_cohen@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window