HOLBROOK COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holbrook Community Pre-School provides sessional day care for pre-school children aged between 2 to 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £78,061 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 October 1992: Standard registration
- HOLBROOK PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Marchant | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Browning | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Walsh | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jolene Ryan | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Green Roseanne | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.21k | £86.91k | £73.15k | £71.25k | £106.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.70k | £85.09k | £79.68k | £73.08k | £100.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £78.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.15k | £898 | N/A | £57.38k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 2006 AND 20 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NORTH HORSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nightingales
Worthing Road
Southwater
HORSHAM
West Sussex
RH13 9HG
- Phone:
- 01403 265793
- Email:
- holbrookpreschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window