BRITISH EDUCATION & SUPPORT TRUST (B.E.S.T.)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education & religion in accordance with the tenets & doctrines of Islamic Faith contained in Quran & Sunnah in particular by providing or assisting in provision of courses, lectures,seminars & classes; Relieve poverty by providing or assisting in the provision of financial assistance to the poor; Advance charitable purpose/s as the managing committee or the society shall decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 1992: Standard registration
- THE SOCIETY OF THE REVIVAL OF ISLAMIC HERITAGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD YUSUF ALQATAMI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Salim Alsharhan | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rashed Abdullah | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr AHMAD ABDUL RAHMAN ABDUL AZIZ ALSHEHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABD AL-RAHMAN AL-JIRAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.94k | £74.15k | £149.83k | £108.00k | £61.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.71k | £81.89k | £149.98k | £114.83k | £24.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 369 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1992, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
A)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENENTS AND DOCTRINES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH CONTAINED IN THE QURAN AND SUNNAH IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF COURSES LECTURES SEMINARS AND OTHER CLASSES B)TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE POOR C)TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE MANAGING COMMITTEE OR THE SOCIETY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Tunstall Road
London
SW9 8BN
- Phone:
- 02073468640
- Email:
- mail@bestuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window