Accounts and annual returns THE LONDON PRINTWORKS TRUST

Charity Number: 1014895
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 06 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 21 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 17 April 2012 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 17 April 2012 77 days late