RED RIBBON INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 26 October 1992: Standard registration
- 23 October 2002: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 23 October 2002: Funds transferred to 297977 NATIONAL AIDS TRUST
- AWARE LTD (Working name)
- RRI (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 OCTOBER 1992 AND 27 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL INTO THE CONDITIONS OF ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME (AIDS) AND HUMAN IMMUNO-DEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) AND THEIR TRANSMISSION TREATMENT AND CONSEQUENCES. (B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITH REFERENCE TO THE TREATMENT, TRANSMISSION, AND CONSEQUENCES OF ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME (AIDS) AND/OR HUMAN IMMUNE-DEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.