WORDS OF LIFE TRUST

Charity number: 1014917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Distribution of free Bible Study Materials for children and young people. Annual Camp for young people. Distribution of Via Magazine

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £6,103
Total expenditure: £5,374

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WORDS OF LIFE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STUART GORDON Trustee 29 July 2012
None on record
JONATHAN HEDLEY GIBSON LIB Trustee
None on record
PAUL ANDREW JACKSON Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH CHRISTINE JACKSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £11.94k £8.50k £5.88k £6.10k £6.10k
Total expenditure £12.19k £7.62k £4.66k £5.26k £5.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 Bilton Grove Avenue
Harrogate
HG1 4HQ
Phone:
01423505678