Accounts and annual returns LINDEN BAROQUE ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1014921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 February 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required