THE ROTARY CLUB OF GREENWICH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1014960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raise funds by holding functions and collecting from the public

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £6,717
Total expenditure: £6,021

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marco Chabbi Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Sarah Paterson Campbell Trustee 31 August 2017
None on record
Ilkay Chirali Trustee 31 August 2017
None on record
John Stock Trustee 31 August 2017
Inverliever youth trust.
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.25k £751 £6.58k £6.88k £6.72k
Total expenditure £5.75k £976 £6.90k £6.34k £6.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
59 GUIBAL ROAD
LONDON
SE12 9LY
Phone:
02088571454