Financial history MARGUERITE BERTHE HOW CHARITY

Charity Number: 1014967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.20k £7.80k £852 £898 £0
Total expenditure £677 £344 £4.04k £6.69k £4.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A