Accounts and annual returns NORTH DORSET CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity number: 1014968
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 05 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 05 November 2015 On Time