THE FREMANTLE TRUST

Charity number: 1014986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing care and support for older people and people with learning disabilities. Services for older people include care homes, care homes with nursing, specialist dementia care, extra care and day care. Respite care services are also offered. Services for people with learning disabilities include supported living schemes, registered care homes, respite care and day activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Bedford
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Harrow
  • Hertfordshire
  • Milton Keynes
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD ANDREW FITZALAN HOWARD Trustee 01 February 2024
COLLEGE OF ARMS TRUST
Received: On time
THE GLOBAL FUND FOR FORGOTTEN PEOPLE, ORDER OF MALTA
Received: On time
Daniel Hayes Trustee 01 February 2024
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Tracey Wardle Trustee 01 February 2024
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Mildred Maria Elisabeth Wentworth-Stanley Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Michael Anthony Stredder Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.34m £45.20m £43.45m £44.30m £48.15m
Total expenditure £46.54m £46.61m £43.49m £44.43m £49.73m
Income from government contracts £16.56m £17.37m £18.62m £19.91m £20.89m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.70m £77.39k £55.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £39.78k £181.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £46.34m £45.20m £43.45m £44.25m £47.49m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £1.00k £4.00k £11.85k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £464.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £46.54m £46.61m £43.49m £44.43m £49.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £44.00k £43.00k £75.00k £65.00k £119.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £4.68m £4.94m £6.60m £6.99m £4.90m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £5.42m £5.66m £5.67m £5.38m £3.36m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£16.79m -£19.09m £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £6.24m £7.61m £7.38m £7.39m £7.01m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Fremantle Trust
Woodley House
64-65 Rabans Close
Rabans Lane Industrial Area
AYLESBURY
Phone:
01296393000