Financial history FRIENDS OF TUDOR

Charity Number: 1014987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/04/2020 16/04/2021 16/04/2022 16/04/2023 16/04/2024
Total gross income £15.96k £498 £1.20k £9.20k £9.59k
Total expenditure £21.12k £0 £300 £4.92k £14.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A