MUELLER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKING GRANTS TO STUDENTS ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN SWAFFHAM NORFOLK WHO DISPLAY PARTICULAR TALENT IN ART
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 October 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 02 November 1992: Standard registration
- 19 August 2013: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- 19 August 2013: Funds transferred to 277789 THE HAMOND EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/10/2008 | 11/10/2009 | 11/10/2010 | 11/10/2011 | 11/10/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83 | £83 | £117 | £7 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £630 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 October 2012 | 06 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 October 2011 | 04 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 October 2010 | 23 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 October 2009 | 17 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
AWARDING GRANTS TO STUDENTS ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS WHO DISPLAY A PARTICULAR TALENT IN ART SUCH GRANTS TO BE AWARDED TOWARDS THE COST OF BOOKS MATERIALS OR VISITS ASSOCIATED WITH ART BUT SO THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT BE OBLIGED TO AWARD A GRANT OR GRANTS IN ANY YEAR IN WHICH THEY DO NOT IN THEIR DISCRETION FEEL THAT SUFFICIENT TALENT OR NEED HAS BEEN SHOWN.
Area of benefit
SWAFFHAM, NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window