Accounts and annual returns GODALMING CARE GROUP

Charity number: 1015023
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 14 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 05 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 24 January 2006 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required