JOYCE MARRIOTT SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of young persons residing within the administrative counties of Cardiff and the Vale of Glamorgan with a special interest and ability in ballet, by the provision of scholarships to attend the Northern Ballet School for the best boy and the best girl selected in any one year by the school to be capable of benefiting from such education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 03 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL ANTHONY JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA PAULINE MARY HICKEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.55k | £9.96k | £10.13k | £10.06k | £10.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50k | £3.34k | £16.05k | £15.66k | £15.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 OCTOBER 1992 AND POWER OF AMENDMENT ORDER DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2006. AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 APRIL 2006. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS RESIDING PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF SOUTH GLAMORGAN WITH A SPECIAL INTEREST AND ABILITY IN BALLET BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO ATTEND THE NORTHERN BALLET SCHOOL(‘THE SCHOOL’) FOR THE BEST BOY AND THE BEST GIRL SELECTED IN ANY ONE YEAR BY THE SCHOOL TO BE CAPABLE OF BENEFITING FROM SUCH EDUCATION (‘THE SELECTED STUDENTS’)
Area of benefit
SOUTH GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 York Place
BARRY
CF62 7ED
- Phone:
- 01446734535
- Email:
- barry@njlm.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window