HOUSING 21 TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is a dormant company limited by guarantee and a registered charity incorporated on 19th October 1992.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 November 1992: Standard registration
- 09 August 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 20 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 25 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 24 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 10 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 18 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 30 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 OCTOBER 1992, AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 1997, 3 NOVEMBER 2003 AND 16 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY DISABLED OR HANDICAPPED PERSON OR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.